US HB4068 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Competitive Need Limitations Modernization Act of 2017 This bill amends the Trade Act of 1974 to revise the competitive need limitation review process by: (1) modifying the deadline for the review process, and (2) establishing the relevant domestic production time frame for such review as within the preceding three years (currently on January 1, 1995). (The competitive need limitation terminates duty-free treatment with respect to articles from a beneficiary developing country if certain import limits are exceeded.)
Title
Competitive Need Limitations Modernization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-10-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2036 (Same As) 2017-10-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4979 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4979 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Foreign trade and international finance
Tariffs
Trade restrictions
Foreign trade and international finance
Tariffs
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4068/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4068/BILLS-115hr4068ih.pdf |