US HB4053 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the system for the public financing of presidential primary and general elections. The bill (1) increases the amount of matching funds for participating candidates by matching the first $200 of contributions by individuals to a candidate at a 6:1 ratio; (2) eliminates spending limits on participating candidates; (3) allows the national committee of a political party to make expenditures of up to $100 million in coordination with participating candidates; (4) requires all payments made to candidates, beginning with the 2028 presidential election, to be made from the Freedom From Influence Fund established by this bill; and (5) prohibits joint fundraising committees for any authorized committee of a candidate.
Title
Empower Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-08-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1917 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1917 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4053/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4053/BILLS-116hr4053ih.pdf |