US HB4045 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-05 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To modernize the hydropower licensing process and to promote next-generation hydropower projects, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hydropower Clean Energy Future Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-05HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 19.
2023-12-05HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-10-25HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 12.
2023-10-24HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-06-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
2023-06-12HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-06-12HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback