US HB4042 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-154. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-154. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1415 West Oak Street, in Kissimmee, Florida, as the "Borinqueneers Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1415 West Oak Street, in Kissimmee, Florida, as the "Borinqueneers Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1415 West Oak Street, in Kissimmee, Florida, as the "Borinqueneers Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-154. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1525-1527) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 332. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-12-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. |
2017-12-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9918) |
2017-12-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Gianforte objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2017-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4042. |
2017-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9818-9819; text: CR H9818-9819) |
2017-12-12 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-11-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-10-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Caribbean area
Congressional tributes
Florida
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Puerto Rico
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Congressional tributes
Florida
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Puerto Rico
Veterans' organizations and recognition