US HB4041 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To terminate the order requiring persons to wear masks while on conveyances and at transportation hubs.
Title
SMART Act Stop Mandating Additional Requirements for Travel Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4441 (Related) 2021-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB2084 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2337 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2685 (Related) 2021-08-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2084 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2337 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2685 (Related) 2021-08-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4041/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4041/BILLS-117hr4041ih.pdf |