US HB4035 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to prioritize veterans court treatment programs that ensure equal access for racial and ethnic minorities and women, and for other purposes.
Title
Real Justice for Our Veterans Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-10-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5940) |
2021-10-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4035. |
2021-10-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5940-5942) |
2021-10-27 | House | Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-10-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 112. |
2021-10-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-154. |
2021-07-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2021-07-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |