US HB403 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To repeal a restriction on the use of funds by the Securities and Exchange Commission to ensure shareholders of corporations have knowledge of corporate political activity.
Title
To repeal a restriction on the use of funds by the Securities and Exchange Commission to ensure shareholders of corporations have knowledge of corporate political activity.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HR179 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
HR179 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/403/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr403/BILLS-117hr403ih.pdf |