US HB4027 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits a social media company's immunity from liability for screening and blocking offensive content on its platform. The bill applies such immunity when the company restricts content that is unlawful rather than merely objectionable. Under current law, such immunity also applies to actions taken to enable or make available the technical means to restrict access to material that is objectionable. The bill instead specifies that this immunity applies to actions taken to (1) make available the technical means to restrict access to material that is unlawful, or (2) provide users with the option to restrict access to any material.
Title
Stop the Censorship Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7808 (Related) 2020-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB4828 (Related) 2020-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB4828 (Related) 2020-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Freedom of information
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Freedom of information
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4027/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4027/BILLS-116hr4027ih.pdf |