US HB4018 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide drought relief in the State of California, and for other purposes.
Title
NEED Water Act Necessary to Ensure Expeditious Delivery of Water Act RENEW WIIN Act Responsible, No-Cost Extension of Western Water Infrastructure Improvements Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA] |
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. Connie Conway [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-06-24 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3093) |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-06-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB737 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4018/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4018/BILLS-117hr4018ih.pdf |