US HB4018 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-19 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 392.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-19 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 392.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the eligibility criteria for an elderly offender to qualify for early release from prison and placement in home detention. Specifically, it reduces the amount of a prison term an elderly offender must serve by the amount of good time credits earned by the offender.
Title
To provide that the amount of time that an elderly offender must serve before being eligible for placement in home detention is to be reduced by the amount of good time credits earned by the prisoner, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] |
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] |
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 392. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9191) |
2019-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4018. |
2019-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9191-9192) |
2019-12-03 | House | Mr. Deutch moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252. |
2019-11-26 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-311. |
2019-09-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 8. |
2019-09-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-10 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged. |
2019-08-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3035 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S7029)
Subjects
Aging
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons