US HB4009 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-178. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Smithsonian National Zoological Park Central Parking Facility Authorization Act (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution to plan, design, and construct a central parking facility on National Zoological Park property in Washington, DC to improve visitor experience and multi-modal access to the park. The bill requires the parking facility to be constructed with funds from nonappropriated sources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smithsonian National Zoological Park Central Parking Facility Authorization Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-178. (TXT | PDF)
2018-06-01SenateSigned by President.
2018-05-21SenatePresented to President.
2018-05-17SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-05-16SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2732-2733)
2018-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
2018-04-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-04-25HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H3520-3521)
2018-04-25HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3520-3521)
2018-04-25HouseMr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2018-04-25HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
2018-04-25HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
2017-12-13HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-12-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-10-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
2017-10-11HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-10-11HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-10-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1954 (Same As) 2017-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback