US HB4 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 227-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Voting Rights Advancement Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting Rights Advancement Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Nancy Pelosi [D-CA]Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD]
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]
Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-23HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 6.
2019-10-22HouseSubcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Discharged.
2019-03-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-02-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB561 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1799 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback