US HB3969 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Became Public Law No: 114-220. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Became Public Law No: 114-220. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Laughlin, Nevada, as the "Master Chief Petty Officer Jesse Dean Department of Veterans Affairs Community-Based Outpatient Clinic". (Sec. 1) This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Laughlin, Nevada, as the "Master Chief Petty Officer Jesse Dean VA Clinic."
Title
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Laughlin, Nevada, as the "Master Chief Petty Officer Jesse Dean Department of Veterans Affairs Community-Based Outpatient Clinic".
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Cresent Hardy [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-220. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-09-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-09-14 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-09-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5482) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-05-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2931) |
2016-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3969. |
2016-05-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2931-2932) |
2016-05-23 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-12-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-11-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Nevada
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Nevada
Veterans' medical care