US HB3953 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-203. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-203. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4122 Madison Street, Elfers, Florida, as the "Private First Class Felton Roger Fussell Memorial Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4122 Madison Street, Elfers, Florida, as the "Private First Class Felton Roger Fussell Memorial Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4122 Madison Street, Elfers, Florida, as the "Private First Class Felton Roger Fussell Memorial Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. John Mica [R-FL] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R-FL] | Rep. David Jolly [R-FL] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] |
Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Gwen Graham [D-FL] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Curt Clawson [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-29 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-203. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-07-29 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-07-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5192-5193) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2923) |
2016-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3953. |
2016-05-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2923) |
2016-05-23 | House | Mr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2015-11-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Florida
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Florida
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service