US HB3941 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide an exclusion from gross income for AmeriCorps educational awards.
Title
Segal AmeriCorps Education Award Tax Relief Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB3000 (Related) 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB4100 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1165 (Related) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1244 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2075 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3000 (Related) 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB4100 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1165 (Related) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1244 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2075 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3941/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3941/BILLS-117hr3941ih.pdf |