US HB3941 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

FedRAMP Authorization Act Federal Risk and Authorization Management Program Authorization Act of 2019 This bill provides statutory authority for the Federal Risk and Authorization Management Program (FedRAMP) within the General Services Administration (GSA). The GSA must establish a government-wide program that provides the authoritative standardized approach to security assessment and authorization for cloud computing products and services that process unclassified information used by agencies. Agencies must ensure that their cloud computing services meet GSA requirements. The bill establishes the Joint Authorization Board to conduct security assessments of cloud computing services and issue provisional authorizations to operate to cloud service providers that meet FedRAMP security guidelines. The GSA shall (1) determine the requirements for certification of independent assessment organizations, and (2) establish the Federal Secure Cloud Advisory Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FedRAMP Authorization Act Federal Risk and Authorization Management Program Authorization Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2020-02-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H815-817)
2020-02-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3941.
2020-02-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H815-819)
2020-02-05HouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-02-05HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 315.
2020-02-05HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 116-391.
2019-12-19HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-07-24HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback