US HB3927 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on November 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
West Coast Ocean Protection Act of 2015 This bill amends the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to prohibit the Department of the Interior from issuing a lease for the exploration, development, or production of oil or natural gas in any area of the outer Continental Shelf off the coast of California, Oregon, or Washington.
Title
West Coast Ocean Protection Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2015-11-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-11-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1977 (Related) 2015-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB3632 (Related) 2015-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB1042 (Related) 2015-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1794 (Related) 2015-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2155 (Same As) 2015-10-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB3632 (Related) 2015-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB1042 (Related) 2015-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1794 (Related) 2015-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2155 (Same As) 2015-10-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
California
Energy
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oil and gas
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Washington State
Energy
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oil and gas
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Washington State
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3927/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3927/BILLS-114hr3927ih.pdf |