US HB3919 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-55.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-55.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that the Federal Communications Commission does not approve radio frequency devices that pose a national security risk.
Title
Secure Equipment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-20 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 420 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-11 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-55. |
2021-11-11 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-11-03 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR H7450) |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2021-10-20 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 4 (Roll no. 323). (text: CR 10/19/2021 H5654-5655) |
2021-10-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5701-5702) |
2021-10-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-10-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3919. |
2021-10-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5654-5656) |
2021-10-19 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-10-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 108. |
2021-10-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-148. |
2021-07-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-20 | House | Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Discharged. |
2021-07-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1790 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 214.