US HB3911 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accelerates and expands certain changes that are scheduled to take effect relating to the coverage of cardiac, intensive cardiac, and pulmonary rehabilitation programs under Medicare. Currently, such programs require physician supervision. Effective January 1, 2024, physician assistants, nurse practitioners, and clinical nurse specialists may also supervise these programs. The bill expedites the effective date of these changes to January 1, 2020, and also allows these practitioners to administer programs in their offices, prepare and sign treatment plans, and prescribe exercise.
Title
Increasing Access to Quality Cardiac Rehabilitation Care Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2842 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Health
Health personnel
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
Nursing
Health
Health personnel
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
Nursing
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3911/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3911/BILLS-116hr3911ih.pdf |