US HB3911 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Risk-Based Credit Examination Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to provide the Securities and Exchange Commission's Office of Credit Ratings with discretion concerning reviewable matters during its annual examination of nationally recognized statistical rating organizations.
Title
Risk-Based Credit Examination Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 615 (Y: 389 N: 32 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2017-11-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 32 (Roll no. 615). (text: CR H8545-8546) |
2017-11-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8581) |
2017-11-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-11-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3911. |
2017-11-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8545-8547) |
2017-11-07 | House | Mr. Huizenga moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-11-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 281. |
2017-11-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-384. |
2017-10-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 60 - 0. |
2017-10-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-10-02 | House | Introduced in House |