US HB390 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To establish the Adams Memorial Commission to carry out the provisions of Public Law 107-62, and for other purposes. This bill establishes the Adams Memorial Commission to replace the Adams Memorial Foundation in planning a permanent memorial in the District of Columbia to honor John Adams and his legacy. The commission terminates after seven years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish the Adams Memorial Commission to carry out the provisions of Public Law 107-62, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-01-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback