US HB3896 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Longshore and Harbor Workers' Compensation Clarification Act of 2014 - Amends the Longshore and Harbor Workers' Compensation Act to define "recreational vessel" as a vessel: being manufactured or operated primarily for pleasure; or leased, rented, or chartered to another for the latter's pleasure. Prescribes the following rules in applying the definition: a vessel being manufactured or built, or being repaired under warranty by its manufacturer or builder, is a recreational vessel if the vessel appears intended, based on its design and construction, to be for ultimate recreational uses. Requires the manufacturer or builder to bear the burden of establishing that a vessel is recreational under this standard; a vessel being repaired, dismantled for repair, or dismantled at the end of its life will be treated as recreational at the time of repair, dismantling for repair, or dismantling, provided that such vessel shares elements of design and construction of traditional recreational vessels and is not normally engaged in a military, commercial or traditionally commercial undertaking; and a vessel will be treated as a recreational vessel if its a public vessel, such as a vessel owned or chartered and operated by the United States, or by a state or local government, at the time of repair, dismantling for repair, or dismantling, provided that such vessel shares elements of design and construction with traditional recreational vessels and is not normally engaged in a military, commercial, or traditionally commercial undertaking. Requires the Secretary of Labor to amend a certain federal regulation to replace its definition of "recreational vessel" with the definition specified in this Act.
Title
Longshore and Harbor Workers' Compensation Clarification Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-07-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6995-6996) |
2014-07-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3896. |
2014-07-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6995-6997) |
2014-07-29 | House | Mr. Walberg moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections. |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Labor
Disability assistance
Labor and employment
Marine and inland water transportation
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Transportation employees
Worker safety and health
Department of Labor
Disability assistance
Labor and employment
Marine and inland water transportation
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Transportation employees
Worker safety and health