US HB3892 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Commerce, acting through the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, to provide for ocean-based climate solutions to reduce carbon emissions and global warming; to make coastal communities more resilient; and to provide for the conservation and restoration of ocean and coastal habitats, biodiversity, and marine mammal and fish populations; and for other purposes.
Title
National Ocean and Coastal Security Improvements Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3764 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 511.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3892/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3892/BILLS-117hr3892ih.pdf |