US HB3879 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-11)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 562.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 562.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth and revises provisions regarding special recreation permits for use by individuals and groups to engage in recreational activities on federal recreational lands and waters.
Title
SOAR Act Simplifying Outdoor Access for Recreation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 562. |
2020-12-18 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2020-12-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-678, Part I. |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-29 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-08-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2019-08-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1665 (Same As) 2019-10-31 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Civil actions and liability
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
User charges and fees
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats