US HB3873 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to clarify the obligation to report acts of foreign election influence and require implementation of compliance and reporting systems by Federal campaigns to detect and report such acts.
Title
Foreign Influence Reporting in Elections Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-07-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1562 (Related) 2019-06-24 - S.Amdt.845 Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB2242 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB4617 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HR650 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2669 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB2242 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB4617 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HR650 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2669 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Congressional elections
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3873/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3873/BILLS-116hr3873ih.pdf |