US HB3872 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

National Flood Insurance Program Reauthorization and Reform Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Flood Insurance Program Reauthorization and Reform Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-07-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1610 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2318 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1144 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2122 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2170 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2187 (Same As) 2019-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2192 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4953-4954)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback