US HB3870 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-21)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Atomic Veterans Healthcare Parity Act This bill includes veterans who participated in the cleanup of Enewetak Atoll in the Marshall Islands during the period January 1, 1977-December 31, 1980, as radiation exposed veterans for purposes of the Department of Veterans Affairs presumption of service-connection for specified cancers.
Title
Atomic Veterans Healthcare Parity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2015-11-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-11-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2791 (Same As) 2016-06-29 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cancer
Marshall Islands
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Cancer
Marshall Islands
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3870/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3870/BILLS-114hr3870ih.pdf |