US HB3855 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to reform asylum procedures, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to reform asylum procedures, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-07-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-07-19HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB517 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3360 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback