US HB3846 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the exportation of Native American cultural items, archaeological resources, and objects of antiquity that were illegally obtained; provides for the return of such items, including voluntary returns; and establishes and revises related criminal penalties. The bill requires the Department of the Interior and the Department of State to each designate a liaison to facilitate and hold trainings and workshops on the voluntary return of human remains or cultural items. Additionally, Interior must refer individuals and organizations to Indian tribes or Native Hawaiian organizations to facilitate the voluntary return of human remains or cultural items; convene an interagency working group; and convene a tribal working group consisting of representatives of Indian tribes and Native Hawaiian organizations to provide advice on issues concerning the return of, and illegal trade in, human remains or cultural items. The bill also increases from 5 years to 10 years the maximum prison term for an individual convicted of selling, purchasing, using for profit, or transporting for sale or profit human remains or cultural items that were illegally obtained.
Title
Safeguard Tribal Objects of Patrimony Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-08-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-08-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2165 (Same As) 2020-12-18 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Archaeology and anthropology
Cemeteries and funerals
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of the Interior
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Historical and cultural resources
Income tax deductions
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Native Americans
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Right of privacy
Smuggling and trafficking
User charges and fees
Advisory bodies
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Archaeology and anthropology
Cemeteries and funerals
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of the Interior
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Historical and cultural resources
Income tax deductions
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Native Americans
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Right of privacy
Smuggling and trafficking
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3846/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3846/BILLS-116hr3846ih.pdf |