US HB3840 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to establish one or more consortia, comprising certain universities, to advise and assist on matters relating to cybersecurity. DOD must establish procedures for organizations within DOD to access such expertise.
Title
National Defense Cybersecurity Consortia Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-07-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2234 (Same As) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB1790 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Computer security and identity theft
Department of Defense
Higher education
Public-private cooperation
Armed forces and national security
Computer security and identity theft
Department of Defense
Higher education
Public-private cooperation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3840/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3840/BILLS-116hr3840ih.pdf |