US HB3838 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title III of the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize Federal support of States in their work to save and sustain the health of mothers during pregnancy, childbirth, and the postpartum period, to eliminate disparities in maternal health outcomes for pregnancy-related and pregnancy-associated deaths, to identify solutions to improve health care quality and health outcomes for mothers, and for other purposes.
Title
Preventing Maternal Deaths Reauthorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] |
Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. Brittany Pettersen [D-CO] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Erin Houchin [R-IN] | Rep. Jonathan Jackson [D-IL] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D-CO] | Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D-TX] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 61 (Y: 382 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338. |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 12 (Roll no. 61). (text: CR H793) |
2024-03-05 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H806) |
2024-03-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-03-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3838. |
2024-03-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H793-796) |
2024-03-05 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-10-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 196. |
2023-10-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-246. |
2023-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0. |
2023-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-07-13 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-13 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 0. |
2023-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-06-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-06-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2415 (Same As) 2023-10-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.