US HB3830 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Office of Management and Budget to expand the information it publishes in its inventory of agency programs. The inventory must include information such as links to program performance reviews and details regarding financial assistance.
Title
Taxpayers Right-To-Know Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2020-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H808-810) |
2020-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3830. |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H808-811) |
2020-02-05 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-12-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-07-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2177 (Same As) 2019-10-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Performance measurement
Executive agency funding and structure
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Performance measurement