US HB382 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Forest Service to convey specified National Forest System acreage to Custer County in South Dakota if the county offers to acquire the land for its market value.
Title
To provide for the conveyance of the Custer County Airport, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB100 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
South Dakota
Transportation and public works
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
South Dakota
Transportation and public works
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/382/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr382/BILLS-116hr382ih.pdf |