US HB3817 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To allow coastal States to participate in regional ocean partnerships with one or more other coastal States that share a common ocean or coastal area with the coastal State to conserve living resources, expand and protect valuable habitats, enhance coastal resilience, and address such other issues related to the shared ocean or coastal area as are determined to be a shared, regional priority by those States.
Title
Regional Ocean Partnership Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3764 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 511.
SB1894 (Related) 2022-02-15 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-78.
SB1894 (Related) 2022-02-15 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-78.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3817/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3817/BILLS-117hr3817ih.pdf |