US HB3816 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-9)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 475.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 475.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that certain discriminatory conduct by covered platforms shall be unlawful, and for other purposes.
Title
American Innovation and Choice Online Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 475. |
2022-12-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-655. |
2021-06-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2021-06-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2992 (Related) 2022-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 301.