US HB3815 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase access to pre-exposure prophylaxis to reduce the transmission of HIV.
Title
PrEP Access and Coverage Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-08-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1926 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1643 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1643 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Disability and health-based discrimination
Family planning and birth control
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Indian social and development programs
Insurance industry and regulation
Life, casualty, property insurance
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Minority health
Prescription drugs
Rural conditions and development
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Disability and health-based discrimination
Family planning and birth control
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Indian social and development programs
Insurance industry and regulation
Life, casualty, property insurance
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Minority health
Prescription drugs
Rural conditions and development
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3815/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3815/BILLS-116hr3815ih.pdf |