US HB3800 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 129-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect human rights and enhance opportunities for LGBTQI people around the world, and for other purposes.
Title
GLOBE Act of 2021 Greater Leadership Overseas for the Benefit of Equality Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1996 (Related) 2021-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB3485 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR900 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3485 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR900 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3800/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3800/BILLS-117hr3800ih.pdf |