US HB3799 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 81-2)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hearing Protection Act of 2015 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) eliminate the $200 transfer tax on firearm silencers, and (2) treat any person who acquires or possesses a firearm silencer as meeting any registration or licensing requirements of the National Firearms Act with respect to such silencer. Any person who pays a tax on a silencer after October 22, 2015 may receive a refund of such tax. The bill amends the federal criminal code to preempt state or local laws that tax or regulate firearm silencers.
Title
Hearing Protection Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-10-22 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-10-22 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-10-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-10-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2236 (Same As) 2015-11-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Federal preemption
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
Taxation
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3799/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3799/BILLS-114hr3799ih.pdf |