US HB3793 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to increase the maximum amount of a policy under the Veterans' Group Life Insurance and Servicemembers' Group Life Insurance, and for other purposes.
Title
Supporting Families of the Fallen Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-20 | House | Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged. |
2021-10-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3793/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3793/BILLS-117hr3793ih.pdf |