US HB3785 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 342.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 342.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chattahoochee River National Recreation Area Boundary Study Act of 2009 - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to study and report to Congress on the suitability and feasibility of including approximately 45 miles of the Chattahoochee River and lands along the river corridor from the southern boundary of the Recreation Area south to the junction of Coweta, Heard, and Carroll Counties, Georgia, within the boundary of the Chattahoochee River National Recreation Area. Requires such study to include an analysis of the feasibility of administering the study area as part of the Recreation Area.
Title
Chattahoochee River National Recreation Area Boundary Study Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Jim Marshall [D-GA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-16 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 342. | |
2010-09-16 | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-597. | |
2010-07-22 | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-07-22 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-07-22 | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. | |
2010-06-10 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-10-14 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-10-08 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Georgia
Government investigations
Lakes and rivers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Government investigations
Lakes and rivers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources