US HB3780 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Service Members' Homebuyer Tax Credit Extension Act of 2009 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend the first-time homebuyer tax credit and related provisions through November 30, 2009, for members of the uniformed services, members of the Foreign Service of the United States, and employees of the intelligence community serving on official extended duty outside the United States for at least 180 days in 2009.
Title
Service Members' Homebuyer Tax Credit Extension Act 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Maffei [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-08 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3573 (Related) 2009-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3590 (Related) 2010-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 111-148.
SB1728 (Related) 2009-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3590 (Related) 2010-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 111-148.
SB1728 (Related) 2009-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Military personnel and dependents
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Military personnel and dependents
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3780/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3780/BILLS-111hr3780ih.pdf |