US HB3777 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 622.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Juab County Conveyance Act of 2018 This bill directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA), upon written request by Juab County in Utah, to convey to the county, without consideration and by quitclaim deed, all right, title, and interest of the United States in and to the Nephi Work Center located at 740 South Main Street in Nephi. The county must pay reasonable costs incurred by USDA for a survey as required by this bill and any required environmental or administrative analysis related to the conveyance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juab County Conveyance Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 622.
2018-07-03HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-803.
2018-06-06HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 13.
2018-06-06HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-06-06HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2018-05-17HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-09-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-09-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-09-14HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback