US HB3776 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 495.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 495.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cyber Diplomacy Act of 2017 This bill sets forth U.S. international cyberspace policy, in furtherance specifically of the promotion of an open, interoperable, reliable, unfettered, and secure Internet governed by a model that promotes human rights, democracy, and the rule of law, while respecting privacy and guarding against deception, fraud, and theft. The bill includes the establishment of an Office of Cyber Issues in the Department of State. The President is encouraged to enter into executive arrangements with foreign governments that support the cyberspace policy.
Title
Cyber Diplomacy Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] |
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 495. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-01-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H435-437) |
2018-01-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3776. |
2018-01-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H435-439) |
2018-01-17 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-01-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 357. |
2018-01-03 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-483. |
2017-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-09-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Africa
Alliances
Argentina
Asia
Australia
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human rights
India
Infrastructure development
Intellectual property
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Israel
Japan
Kenya
Latin America
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Oceania
Protest and dissent
Religion
Right of privacy
Rule of law and government transparency
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade secrets and economic espionage
United Kingdom
Alliances
Argentina
Asia
Australia
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human rights
India
Infrastructure development
Intellectual property
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Israel
Japan
Kenya
Latin America
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Oceania
Protest and dissent
Religion
Right of privacy
Rule of law and government transparency
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade secrets and economic espionage
United Kingdom