US HB3764 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 574.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians Restoration Act of 2018 (Sec. 3) This bill extends federal recognition to the Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians of Montana. (Sec. 4) The bill makes the tribe and its members eligible for services and benefits provided by the United States to federally recognized tribes and their members, without regard to the existence of a reservation or the location of the residence of any member. The service area of the tribe is considered to be the area comprised of Blaine, Cascade, Glacier, and Hill Counties in Montana. (Sec. 6) The tribe, as a condition of receiving recognition, services, and benefits, must submit to the Department of the Interior, and maintain, a membership roll. (Sec. 7) Interior must take into trust for the benefit of the tribe 200 acres of land within the tribe's service area to be used for a tribal land base.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians Restoration Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 574.
2018-09-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8128)
2018-09-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3764.
2018-09-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8128-8129)
2018-09-12HouseMr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-09-10HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 721.
2018-09-10HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-928.
2018-07-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2018-07-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-07-11HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
2017-09-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-09-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-09-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB39 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 94.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback