US HB3759 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-44)
Status: Passed on January 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-119. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

RAISE Family Caregivers Act Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2017 (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to develop and make publicly available a National Family Caregiving Strategy that identifies recommended actions for recognizing and supporting family caregivers in a manner that reflects their diverse needs. (Sec. 4) HHS shall convene a Family Caregiving Advisory Council to advise the department on recognizing and supporting family caregivers. (Sec. 6) The council shall terminate after three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RAISE Family Caregivers Act Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2017

Sponsors

Rep. Gregg Harper [R]Rep. Kathy Castor [D]Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R]
Rep. Pete Sessions [R]Rep. Luke Messer [R]Rep. John Larson [D]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D]Rep. Sean Maloney [D]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D]Rep. Jacky Rosen [D]Rep. Richard Nolan [D]Rep. Michael Simpson [R]
Rep. Ryan Costello [R]Rep. Andre Carson [D]Rep. David McKinley [R]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D]
Rep. Collin Peterson [D]Rep. Mike Quigley [D]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D]Rep. James Langevin [D]Rep. Grace Meng [D]Rep. Paul Tonko [D]
Rep. Darin LaHood [R]Rep. Judy Chu [D]Rep. John Katko [R]Rep. Lois Frankel [D]
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R]Rep. Peter King [R]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D]Rep. Seth Moulton [D]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D]Rep. Jared Polis [D]Rep. Mark Takano [D]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D]Rep. Donald Norcross [D]Rep. Joe Wilson [R]Rep. Michael Doyle [D]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D]Rep. John Lewis [D]Rep. Betty McCollum [D]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D]Rep. James Renacci [R]Rep. Daniel Donovan [R]
Rep. Paul Mitchell [R]Rep. Keith Ellison [D]Rep. Rodney Davis [R]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D]Rep. David Roe [R]Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D]
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D]Rep. Mike Bishop [R]
Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D]Rep. Krysten Sinema [D]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D]Rep. Don Young [R]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R]Rep. Gene Green [D]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D]Rep. Todd Rokita [R]Rep. Kevin Cramer [R]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D]
Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D]Rep. Al Green [D]Rep. Joe Courtney [D]
Rep. Denny Heck [D]Rep. Julia Brownley [D]Rep. Greg Walden [R]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R]
Rep. James Himes [D]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D]Rep. Ron Estes [R]Rep. Adam Smith [D]
Rep. Earl Carter [R]Rep. Katherine Clark [D]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D]Rep. David Rouzer [R]
Rep. Don Bacon [R]Rep. John Faso [R]Rep. Brian Mast [R]Rep. Tom Emmer [R]
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D]Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R]Rep. Scott Peters [D]Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R]
Rep. Don Beyer [D]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D]Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R]Rep. James McGovern [D]
Rep. David Cicilline [D]Rep. Diane Black [R]Rep. Christopher Smith [R]Rep. Kevin Yoder [R]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-22SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-119. (TXT | PDF)
2018-01-22SenateSigned by President.
2018-01-10SenatePresented to President.
2018-01-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-01-08SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
2018-01-08SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S68-69)
2017-12-19SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2017-12-18HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-12-18HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10148-10149)
2017-12-18HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3759.
2017-12-18HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10148-10152)
2017-12-18HouseMr. Estes (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-09-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
2017-09-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1028 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback