US HB3750 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Technology Maturation Act of 2017
Title
Energy Technology Maturation Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces. |
2017-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1799 (Same As) 2018-05-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 419.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Energy
Energy research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Technology transfer and commercialization
Energy
Energy research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Technology transfer and commercialization
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3750/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3750/BILLS-115hr3750ih.pdf |