US HB3749 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-12)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Legal Services for Homeless Veterans Act This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to make grants to eligible entities that provide legal services to homeless veterans and veterans at risk for homelessness. To be eligible, an entity must (1) be a public or nonprofit private entity with the capacity to effectively administer a grant, (2) demonstrate that adequate financial support will be available to provide legal services to homeless veterans and veterans at risk for homelessness, and (3) agree to meet the VA's established requirements and demonstrate a capacity to meet such requirements. The bill requires the VA to (1) use a specified portion of the grants to provide legal services to women veterans, and (2) report on areas where VA programs are failing to meet the needs of women veterans who are homeless.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal Services for Homeless Veterans Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2020-02-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1177)
2020-02-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3749.
2020-02-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1176-1179)
2020-02-25HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-16HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-10-16HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-08-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
2019-07-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-07-12HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback