US HB3738 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Financial Research Accountability Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to require the Office of Financial Research within the Department of the Treasury to publish annually a detailed work plan of the Office priorities for the upcoming fiscal year, including a detailed description of the progress made by primary financial regulatory agencies in adopting a unique alphanumeric system ("Legal Entity Identifier") to identify legally distinct entities that engage in financial transactions, as well as a list of regulations requiring the use of such a system and actions taken to ensure its adoption by those agencies. The bill requires the Office to develop and implement a cybersecurity plan using adequate safeguards to protect the integrity and confidentiality of the data in Office possession.
Title
Office of Financial Research Accountability Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 473. |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-608. |
2015-11-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 35 - 22. |
2015-11-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-11-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-10-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-10-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Computer security and identity theft
Department of the Treasury
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Advisory bodies
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Computer security and identity theft
Department of the Treasury
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement