US HB3737 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Social Media Use in Clearance Investigations Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Office of Management and Budget to report on the examination of social media activity during security clearance investigations.
Title
Social Media Use in Clearance Investigations Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1416) |
2018-03-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3737. |
2018-03-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1416-1417) |
2018-03-06 | House | Mr. Blum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 382. |
2018-01-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-512. |
2017-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Internet and video services
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Internet and video services