US HB3730 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish the Advisory Committee on United States Outlying Areas and Freely Associated States to provide advice and guidance to the VA on matters relating to veterans residing in American Samoa, Guam, Puerto Rico, the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, the U.S. Virgin Islands, the Federated States of Micronesia, the Republic of the Marshall Islands, and the Republic of Palau. Among other duties, the committee must advise the VA on how to improve its programs and services to better serve veterans living in the listed areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend title 38, United States Code, to establish in the Department of Veterans Affairs an Advisory Committee on United States Outlying Areas and Freely Associated States, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 420 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-19SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2021-11-18HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-11-18HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 4 (Roll no. 380). (text: 11/16/2021 CR H6291-6292)
2021-11-18HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6596)
2021-11-16HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-11-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3730.
2021-11-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6291-6292)
2021-11-16HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-11-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-11-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-11-04HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged.
2021-09-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
2021-06-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2021-06-04HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E606)
2021-06-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB4141 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback